U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEROLI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.