U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.