U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.