U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.