U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00001-19
  • Case Name: USA v. CANELA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 07, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.