U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STEPHENS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.