U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.