U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 31, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.