U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WADE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.