U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.