U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00097
  • Case Name: ARCHIBALD v. AT&T D/B/A CELLULAR WORLD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.