U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00104
  • Case Name: PRUDENT v. WASHBURN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order for Response (Habeas Petition)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Transfer/Local Rule 3.4 Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.