U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAMBERS, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.