U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cv-00052
  • Case Name: SOUTHERN PINE CREDIT UNION v. COACTION GLOBAL, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.