U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.