U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.