U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00212
  • Case Name: COPELAND et al v. TRISTAR PRODUCTS INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Order for Pretrial Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order for Pretrial Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.