U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00162
  • Case Name: CALLOWAY v. RITE WAY ANIMAL REMOVAL LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order - Rules 16/26]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.