U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00272
  • Case Name: BURROUGHS et al v. HILL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to File Prisoner Account Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to File Prisoner Account Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.