U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.