U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00020-3
  • Case Name: USA v. LEONARD, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • August 04, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.