U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00318
  • Case Name: GALL v. DANIELS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.