U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00147
  • Case Name: GEORGIOU FAMILY TRUST et al v. RUTHEN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling/Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order - Rules 16/26]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.