U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00364
  • Case Name: PEREZ v. GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.