U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOBBS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.