U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLYNN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.