U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00163
  • Case Name: SMITH v. SOUTHWEST GEORGIA JUDICIAL CIRCUIT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.