U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.