U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IAKOVOU, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.