U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00026-6
  • Case Name: USA v. RAHMING, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.