U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.