U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUTLER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.