U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00019-7
  • Case Name: USA v. MULLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2024: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.