U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00012-5
  • Case Name: USA v. CERVANTES et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.