U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAMOS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.