U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00062
  • Case Name: FOWLER et al v. GEORGIA RENEWABLE POWER LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.