U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00198
  • Case Name: OBIAGWU v. BALDWIN MEMORIAL CREMATORY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order - Rules 16/26]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.