U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00034-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POPOCA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.