U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00065-14
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2024: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Authorization to Disclose Information]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.