U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: USA v. FLEMING, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2024: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.