U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00135
  • Case Name: ANDROS et al v. TINSLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.