U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GLIVENS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 10, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.