U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOLLY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.