U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54299
  • Case Name: Derrick K Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Employer Deduction Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.