U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54595
  • Case Name: Wakenya Jevarris Dunn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Payment Advices]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [03-Motion to Avoid Lien with Notice to Respond]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Statement of Intention]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule J]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule I]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule H]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule G]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule E/F]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule D]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule C]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Schedule A/B]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees In Installments (532)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [03g-Order Granting Application to Pay in Installments (10-day)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.