U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54592
  • Case Name: Barry O. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice Setting Last Day to File Claims]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim and/or Administrative Claims, Motion to]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122B)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule J]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule I]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule H]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule G]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule E/F]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule D]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule C]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule A/B]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [07-Application to Employ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Stay, Motion to]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.