U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54619
  • Case Name: Adria Latrice DeVaughns
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Extend Stay, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Employer Deduction Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.