U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54615
  • Case Name: Deborah Subrina Holloway
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Modified Plan and of Deadlines for Objections]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule J]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule I]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [02-Chapter 13 - Pre-Confirmation Plan Modification]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Miscellaneous Deficiencies]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Extend Stay, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.