U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54611-jwc
  • Case Name: Sophia Mofay Kelley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees In Installments (532)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [03g-Order Granting Application to Pay in Installments (10-day)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.