U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54632-bem
  • Case Name: Terri Denise Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order re: In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Payment Advices]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Order to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Application for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (103B)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.